Bachelor of Economics, University Malaya
Master of Arts (Economics), Western Michigan University
Working Experience
1 August 2004 to 28 February 2007
Ketua Setiausaha Perbendaharaan, Kementerian Kewangan
1 May 2003 to 31 July 2004
Ketua Setiausaha, Kementerian Kerja Raya
1999 to 2003
Pengarah Bahagian Belanjawan
1993 to 1999
Pengurus Besar Pentadbiran/Setiausaha Syarikat, KL International Airport Berhad, syarikat milik sepenuhnya Menteri Kewangan
1986 to 1993
Bahagian Belanjawan
1983 to 1986
Bahagian Ekonomi dan Antarabangsa
1980 to 1981
Bahagian Khidmat Hutang dan Pinjaman
1975 to 1979
Bahagian Belanjawan
1972 to 1975
Bahagian Pentadbiran
Directorship of Public Companies
Nil
Family Relationship
Nil
Interest
Nil
Composition
Keong Choon Keat (Chairman)(Independent Non-Executive)
Dato' N. Sadasivan a/l N. N. Pillay (Independent Non-Executive)
Dato' Zaharaah binti Shaari (Non-Independent Non-Executive)
Datuk Haji Yusoff @ Hunter bin Datuk Haji Mohamad Kasim (Independent Non-Executive)
Market Buzz
No result.
Discussions
Be the first to like this. Showing 0 of 0 comments
This book is the result of the author's many years of experience and observation throughout his 26 years in the stockbroking industry. It was written for general public to learn to invest based on facts and not on fantasies or hearsay....