M.A. Development Economics, University of Sussex, United Kingdom
Bachelor of Economics, University of Western Australia
Working Experience
1973 - 1977
Assistant Secretary, Agriculture Sector State Planning Unit Sarawak
1977 - 1983
Economist, International Pepper Community Jakarta, Indonesia
1983 - 1985
Principal Assistant Secretary, State Planning Unit, Sarawak
1986 - 1989
Project Director, Kalaka-Saribas Integrated Agriculture Development Project (IADP), Project Management Unit, Sarawak, Ministry of Agriculture Malaysia
1990- 1994
Deputy Director/Principal Assistant Director, State Planning Unit, Sarawak
1995 - 2000
Director, State Planning Unit
2000 - 30 June 2004
Deputy State Secretary (Planning & Development)
1 July 2004 - 30 June 2006
Deputy State Secretary (Human Resources)
1 July 2006 - 31 December 2006
Deputy State Secretary (Administration, Security & Protocol)
1 January 2007 - 1 January 2008
State Secretary Sarawak
Directorship of Public Companies
Employees Provident Fund Board (EPF Board)
Sarawak Energy Berhad (SEB)
Sarawak Economic Development Corporation Board (SEDC)
Malaysian Institute of Research (MIER)
Family Relationship
Nil
Conflict of Interest
Nil
Interest
Nil
Composition
Keong Choon Keat (Chairman) (Independent Non-Executive)
Dato' N. Sadasivan a/l N.N. Pillay (Independent Non-Executive)
Datuk Amar Wilson Baya Dandot (Independent Non-Executive)
Market Buzz
No result.
Discussions
Be the first to like this. Showing 0 of 0 comments
This book is the result of the author's many years of experience and observation throughout his 26 years in the stockbroking industry. It was written for general public to learn to invest based on facts and not on fantasies or hearsay....