Working Experience
15 July 1977 - 24 September 1981
Manpower Officer, Ministry of Manpower and Environmental Development, Sabah
25 September 1981 - 31 August 1984
State Protocol and Ceremonial Officer, Protocol and Ceremonial Division, the Chief Minister's Department, Sabah
1 September 1984 - 23 September 1984
Administrative Officer, State Development Office, Sabah
24 September 1984 - 6 May 1994
Confidential Secretary to the Head of State, State Palace, Sabah
7 May 1994 - 15 May 1996
Administrative Officer, State Ministry of Agriculture and Fisheries, Sabah
16 May 1996 - 22 March 1998
Administrative Officer, Ministry of Rural Development, Sabah
23 March 1998 - 12 January 2000
Administrative Officer, State Public Service Department, Sabah
13 January 2000 - 23 April 2000
Administrative Officer, Ministry of Infrastructure Development, Sabah
24 April 2000 - 30 September 2004
Administrative Officer, State Public Service Department, Sabah
1 October 2004 - 24 July 2007
Director, Administrative Officer, State Public Service Department, Sabah
25 July 2007 - 2 July 2007
Administrative Officer, State Public Service Department, Sabah
3 July 2007 - current
State Secretary, the Chief Minister's Department, Sabah
Directorship of Public Companies
Borneo Housing Mortgage Finance Berhad
Kumpulan Wang Simpanan Pekerja
Universiti Malaysia Sabah