1. International Management Centre, Buckingham, United Kingdom - Master of Business Administration 2. Malaysian Institute of Accountants, Malaysia - Member 3. Malaysian Institute of Certified Public Accountants, Malaysia - Member
Mr Seow joined KPMG Malaysia in 1977 and qualified as a Certified Public Accountant in 1980. In 1983, he was seconded to KPMG United States to gain overseas experience, specialising in banking assignments. He returned in 1985 and was admitted as Partner in 1990. He has been the audit partner on a wide range of companies including public listed companies and multinationals in banking and finance, manufacturing, trading and services. In addition, he held various leadership roles including those of Human Resource Partner, Partner in charge of Financial Services and a member of the KPMG Asia Pacific Board. He was a member of Executive Committee of the Malaysian Institute of Certified Public Accountants from 2009 to 2011 and a Council member of the Malaysian Institute of Accountants from 2007 to 2011. He was the Managing Partner of KPMG Malaysia from 2007 to 2010. He retired from the firm in 2011.
1. Southern Steel Berhad 2. Hume Industries Berhad 3. Dolomite Corporation Berhad
Nil
Nil
Nil
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-23
2024-09-23
2024-09-23
2024-09-20
2024-09-20
2024-09-20
2024-09-19
2024-09-18
2024-09-18
2024-09-17
2024-09-17