2013 - 2016: Vice President & Venture Director, Pengerang Integrated Complex (PIC), PETRONAS : Chief Executive Officer, PETRONAS Refinery and Petrochemical Corporation Sdn. Bhd. 2010 - 2012: Vice President, Human Resource Management Division, PETRONAS 2009 - 2010: Vice President, Education Division , PETRONAS 2005 - 2009: Chief Executive Officer, Malaysian Philharmonic Orchestra & Dewan Filharmonik 2003 - 2005: General Manager (Marketing & Trading-Chemicals), MITCO Sdn. Bhd. 2001 - 2003: Senior Manager (Marketing & Trading-Chemicals), MITCO Sdn. Bhd. 1991 - 2001: Manager, Human Resource Management, PETRONAS 1994 - 1997: Manager, Petrochemicals Business Planning Unit, Petrochemical Divison, PETRONAS : Manager, Business Evaluation Department, Corporate Planning Division, PETRONAS 1991 - 1994: Executive (Analyst), Refining & Marketing Planning Unit, PETRONAS 1991: Executive (Refinery), PETRONAS Penapisan (Melaka) Sdn. Bhd. 1988 - 1990: Production Planner (Refinery), PETRONAS Penapisan (Terengganu) Sdn. Bhd. 1982 - 1987: Chemist, Process Engineering & Technical, PETRONAS Penapisan (Terengganu) Sdn. Bhd. 1981 - 1982: Chemist, Laboratory Services, PETRONAS Penapisan (Terengganu) Sdn. Bhd. Throughout her career, she has gained a wide range of hands-on experience in Laboratory Operations, Petroleum Refinery Operations, Project Management, Corporate Planning & Business Development, Human Resources and Marketing & Trading. She retired from PETRONAS in 2016 after 35 years of service.
Tenaga Nasional Bhd
Nil
Nil
Ordinary Shares in Dialog Group Berhad:- Direct Interest - 8,345 (0.00%) Deemed Interest - 47,340 (0.00%)
2024-09-26
2024-09-25
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-23
2024-09-19
2024-09-18
2024-09-18
2024-09-18