Dato' Lim Kooi Ting obtained his Bachelor of Commerce Degree in 1972 from Bombay University, India.
Working Experience
Dato' Lim was first appointed to the Company's Board as Group Managing Director on 24 November 1995. Dato' Lim was subsequently re-designated as an Executive Director on 23 September 2005. Upon his retirement on 1 September 2006, Dato' Lim was re-designated as a Non-Independent Non-Executive Director of the Company. Dato' Lim subsequently resigned from the Company's Board on 29 May 2009 and was re-appointed as Independent Non-Executive Director of the Company on 28 May 2012. Dato' Lim has been re-designated as the Senior Independent Non-Executive Director with effect from 21 April 2015. Dato' Lim joined T.H. Hin Sdn. Bhd., a Company principally involved in the import and trading of electrical gas and household appliances, as Managing Director in 1977. In 1986, he established PT Howezen Casting Industry in Indonesia to manufacture household electrical products and gas cookers and appliances. During his tenure as Group Managing Director with the Milux Group, Dato' Lim was deeply involved in research & development, marketing, contract arrangement and supervision of all types of products manufactured by the Group.
Directorship of Public Companies
Not Applicable
Family Relationship
Mr. Lim Kooi Ting is the brother of Mr. Lim Kooi How who is the substantial shareholder of the Company.
This book is the result of the author's many years of experience and observation throughout his 26 years in the stockbroking industry. It was written for general public to learn to invest based on facts and not on fantasies or hearsay....