Mr See Ah Sing joined the Malaysian Civil Service in 1984. He has served in various ministries including the Ministry of Housing, Economic Planning Unit and Ministry of Finance. He was the Chief Executive Officer of Pantai Fomema for 3 years. He was also an executive director of Protasco Berhad. Prior to his appointment as Executive Director,he worked as a freelance consultant in business development, M&A and strategic planning. He was appointed as an Independent Non-Executive Director of Avillion Berhad (Formerly known as Reliance Pacific Berhad) on 28 November 2014. He was subsequently appointed as an Executive Director of Avillion Berhad (Formerly known as Reliance Pacific Berhad) on 22 April 2015 and re-designated as Group Managing Director of Avillion Berhad (Formerly known as Reliance Pacific Berhad) on 10 October 2016. He retired from Avillion Berhad (Formerly known as Reliance Pacific Berhad) on 25 September 2017.
Mr See Ah Sing is the spouse of Ms Hedy Gan See Tong who is the director and shareholder of Mazmur Capital Sdn Bhd. Mazmur Capital Sdn Bhd is a substantial shareholder of Avillion Berhad.
NIL
Indirect shares held in Avillion Berhad 248,178,113 ordinary shares.