He is currently the Group Financial Controller of V.S. Industry Berhad. He was the Alternate Director of the Company prior to his cessation on 19 March 2020.
Nil
Nil
Nil
500,000 ordinary shares held at V.S. Industry Berhad
2024-09-27
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-25
2024-09-24
2024-09-24
2024-09-23
2024-09-20
2024-09-19
2024-09-17
2024-09-16