1. Degree - Bachelor of Arts (Economics) [University of Malaya]
2. Masters - Economics [London School of Economics]
3. Doctorate - Economics [London School of Economics]
4. Professional Qualification - Fellow [Institute of Bankers Malaysia]
Working Experience
Dato' Dr. R. Thillainathan has been with the Genting Group since 1989. He was the Chief Operating Officer of the Company from 27 November 2002 to 9 September 2006 and retired as Executive Director on 30 July 2007. He was redesignated as an Independent Non-Executive Director of the Company on 30 July 2009. He also sits on the Boards of Public Investment Bank Berhad and IDEAS Policy Research Berhad. Dato' Dr. R. Thillainathan has extensive years of experience in finance and banking. He is the past President of Malaysian Economic Association. He is currently a trustee of two companies limited by guarantee namely Child Information, Learning and Development Centre and Yayasan MEA.
Directorship of Public Companies
1. Allianz Malaysia Berhad 2. Allianz General Insurance Company (Malaysia) Berhad 3. Allianz Life Insurance Malaysia Berhad 4. Institute for Democracy and Economic Affairs Berhad 5. Private Pension Administrator Malaysia 6. Public Investment Bank Berhad 7. Yayasan MEA 8. CHILD Information, Learning and Development Centre
Interest
Dato' Dr. Thillainathan holds 20,000 ordinary shares and 5,000 warrants in Genting Berhad. Pursuant to Section 59(11)(c) of the Companies Act, 2016, his spouse and children collectively hold 623,000 ordinary shares and 155,750 warrants in Genting Berhad whilst his spouse holds 10,000 ordinary shares and 2,000 warrants in Genting Plantations Berhad.
This book is the result of the author's many years of experience and observation throughout his 26 years in the stockbroking industry. It was written for general public to learn to invest based on facts and not on fantasies or hearsay....