Bachelor of Arts (Honours) Degree in Economics and an Associate of the Asian Institute of Chartered Bankers.
Mr Lai Wan was appointment as a Director of Public Bank on 26 April 2012. Mr Lai has 43 years of experience in the banking and finance related industries. He had served Bank Negara Malaysia for 20 years and the last position held before his resignation in 1985 was as the Deputy Manager, Bank Examination and Internal Audit Department. Mr Lai had working experience in 3 finance companies from 1985 to 1994 where he had held senior management positions. He was appointed the President/Chief Executive Officer of a Malaysian bank in 1997 until his retirement on 31 December 2000. Upon his retirement from full time employment, Mr Lai continued to be engaged in finance related industries through his directorships in various companies.
Nil
Nil
Indirect interests - 18,654 shares (held by spouse)
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-25
2024-09-24
2024-09-23
2024-09-20
2024-09-19
2024-09-19
2024-09-18
2024-09-18
2024-09-18