Mr Lai Wan was appointed as an Independent Non-Executive Director of Public Bank on 26 April 2012. He was appointed as an Independent Non-Executive Deputy Chairman of Public Bank on 26 September 2017 and was redesignated as Independent Non-Executive Chairman of Public Bank with effect from 1 January 2019. Mr Lai has 46 years of experience in the banking and finance related industries. He had served Bank Negara Malaysia for 20 years and the last position held before his resignation in 1985 was as the Deputy Manager, Bank Examination and Internal Audit Department. Mr Lai had working experience in three finance companies from 1985 to 1994 where he had held senior management positions. Mr Lai was appointed the President/Chief Executive Officer of a Malaysian bank in 1997 until his retirement on 31 December 2000. Upon retirement from full time employment, Mr Lai continued to be engaged in finance related industries through his directorships in various companies.
Nil
Nil
Deemed interests: 93,270 shares (held by spouse)
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-26
2024-09-25
2024-09-24
2024-09-23
2024-09-20
2024-09-19
2024-09-19
2024-09-18
2024-09-18
2024-09-18